EP0248057 - GLUCOSE TOLERANCE FACTOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ANHEUSER-BUSCH COMPANIES, INC. One Busch Place St. Louis Missouri 63118 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states ANHEUSER-BUSCH COMPANIES, INC. One Busch Place St. Louis Missouri 63118 / US | ||
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states ANHEUSER-BUSCH, INC. One Busch Place St. Louis Missouri 63118 / US | ||
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states ANHEUSER-BUSCH, INCORPORATED One Busch Place St. Louis Missouri 63118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, David 1207 S. 9th Avenue Arcadia, CA 91006 / US | 02 /
LEV-RAN, Arye 4366 Avenida Carmel Cypress, CA 90630 / US | 03 /
BARSEGHIAN, Ken deceased / US | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1987/50] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86907204.1 | 19.11.1986 | [1987/50] | WO1986US02493 | Priority number, date | US19850795977 | 21.11.1985 Original published format: US 795977 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703200 | Date: | 04.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248057 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248057 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.06.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, B01D15/04, B01D15/08 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
C07D215/38 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
B01D15/34 (EP);
C07D215/42 (EP);
B01D15/325 (EP);
B01D15/361 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D15/34, B01D15/325, B01D15/361 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | GLUKOSETOLERANZFAKTOR UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [1987/50] | English: | GLUCOSE TOLERANCE FACTOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [1987/50] | French: | FACTEUR DE TOLERANCE DU GLUCOSE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1987/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.1987 | Search fee paid | 27.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 3, 17th July 1978, page 125, abstract no. 17663d, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.W. TUMAN et al.: "Comparison and effects of natural and synthetic glucose tolerance factor in normal and genetically diabetic mice", & DIABETES 1978, 27(1), 49-56 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 99, no. 5, 1st August 1983, page 274, abstract no. 35480c, Columbus, Ohio, US; S.J. HAYLOCK et al.: "Separation of biologically active chromium-containing complexes from yeast extracts and other sources of glucose tolerance factor (GTF) activity", & J. INORG. BIOCHEM. 1983, 18(3), 195-211 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 3, 22nd July 1985, page 318, abstract no. 19604s, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.M. DAVIES et al.: "The isolation of glucose tolerance factors from brewer's yeast and their relationship to chromium", & BIOCHEM. MED. 1985, 33(3), 297-311 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 25, 22nd December 1986, page 405, abstract no. 222258r, Columbus, Ohio, US; D.M. DAVIES et al.: "The isolation of glucose tolerance factors from brewer's yeast and their relationship to chromium", & TRACE ELEM. MAN. ANIM. TEMA 5, PROC. INT. SYMP., 5TH 1984 (PUB. 1985), 536-9 | International search | [A]US4242257 (SILIO FERNANDO [ES]); | [A]US4343905 (SZALAY ANDREW) |