EP0230874 - Benzothiazolylazolidines, and their production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.1992 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY, LIMITED Kitahama 4-chome 5-33 Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haga, Toru 14-7, Mefu 2-chome Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagano, Eiki 1-401, Ryodo-cho 4-chome Nishinomiya-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Morita, Kouichi 11-7-406, Sonehigashi-machi 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Sato, Ryo 10-3-334, Sonehigashi-machi 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100058.4 | 05.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860001172 | 06.01.1986 Original published format: JP 117286 | JP19860059035 | 17.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5903586 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230874 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230874 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D471/04, C07D277/68, // (C07D487/04, 249:00, 237:00),(C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00) | [1987/32] | CPC: |
C07D277/68 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/32] | Title | German: | Benzothiazolylazolidine und ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1991/48] | English: | Benzothiazolylazolidines, and their production and use | [1987/32] | French: | Benzothiazolylazolidines, leur production et leur utilisation | [1987/32] |
Former [1987/32] | Benzothiazolylazolidine und ihre Herstellung und Vwerwendung | Examination procedure | 20.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 04.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0176101 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | EP0070389 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | EP0075267 [ ] (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | EP0104484 [ ] (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]); | DE2526358 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) | Examination | US3958976 | JPH05344587 |