EP0273994 - A fragmentation bomb [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISRAEL MILITARY INDUSTRIES LTD. 64 Sderot Bialik P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47100 / IL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states ISRAEL MILITARY INDUSTRIES LTD. 64 Sderoth Bialik P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47100 / IL | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states THE STATE OF ISRAEL MINISTRY OF DEFENCE ISRAEL MILITARY INDUSTRIES 64 Sderoth Bialik P.O.Box 1044 Ramat Hasharon 47 100 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eyal, Joseph 13 Hamitnahlim Street Ramat Hasharon 47100 / IL | 02 /
Rosenberg, Avraham 14 Greenbaum Street Holon 58 375 / IL | 03 /
Zalmon, Seev, Willy 18 Netiv Ofakim Street Haifa / IL | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100092.3 | 07.01.1987 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273994 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273994 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/28, F42B12/10 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
F42B12/10 (EP,US);
F42B12/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/28] | F42B13/18, F42B13/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Bombe mit Splitterhülle | [1988/28] | English: | A fragmentation bomb | [1988/28] | French: | Bombe à fragmentation | [1988/28] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 24.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR996E [ ] (RHEINISCHE METALLW & MASCHF [FR]); | FR524903 [ ] (LE MINISTRE DE L ARMEMENT ET D); | US2798431 [ ] (SEMON HOWARD W, et al); | FR1257604 [ ] (SOC TECH DE RECH IND); | FR2136218 [ ] (PRB SA); | US3855933 [ ] (MESSINEO J); | USB282081I [ ]; | FR2523716 [ ] (ALSETEX [FR]) | Examination | EP0176885 |