EP0234197 - Process for patching damaged parts in a paper-making cloth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Cartmell Road Blackburn Lancashire BB2 3SZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Cartmell Road Blackburn Lancashire BB2 3SZ / GB | ||
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states Waldvogel, Hartmut, Dr.-Ing. Schumannstrasse 6 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | ||
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states Hermann Wangner GmbH & Co. KG Föhrstrasse 39 D-72760 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waldvogel, Hartmut, Dr. Schumannstrasse 6 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | 02 /
Borel, Georg Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 101/83 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Funge, Harry, et al M'CAW & CO. 41-51 Royal Exchange Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | [1990/02] |
Former [1988/21] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/36] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100182.2 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | DE19863600577 | 10.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3600577 | [1987/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234197 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234197 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/00 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
D21F1/0027 (EP,US);
B29C35/0266 (EP,US);
B29C35/08 (EP,US);
B29C73/02 (EP,US);
D21F1/0054 (EP,US);
D21F1/0063 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2793/0045 (EP,US);
B29K2035/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Flicken von Schadenstellen in Papiermaschinenbespannungen | [1987/36] | English: | Process for patching damaged parts in a paper-making cloth | [1987/36] | French: | Procédé pour réparer un dégât dans une toile pour machine à papier | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/18] | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 07.11.1989 | Date of receipt | 16.02.1990 | Request accepted | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.03.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   28.04.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.11.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3664907 (PRICE KENNETH R); | [A]US3681841 (LEBLANC LEO J, et al); | [A]US4090897 (MINICK DAVID G) |