EP0229645 - Process for producing an antifalsification paper with an incorporated security element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 81307 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states GAO Gesellschaft für Automation und Organisation mbH Postfach 70 07 03 D-81307 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Walter, Dr. Stadelberg 12 D-8160 Miesbach / DE | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 D-80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100201.0 | 09.01.1987 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | DE19863601114 | 16.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3601114 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229645 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229645 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D21H27/00, D21F11/08, D21F1/44 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
D21H21/42 (EP);
D21F1/44 (EP);
D21F11/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/30] | D21H5/10, D21F11/08, D21F1/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sicherheitspapiers mit eingelagertem Sicherheitselement | [1987/30] | English: | Process for producing an antifalsification paper with an incorporated security element | [1987/30] | French: | Procédé de production d'un papier de sécurité à élément de sécurité incorporé | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 19.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1687140 (ANTON PLEYER); | [A]GB698684 (ATLANTIC GUMMED PAPER CORP); | [A]GB1220070 (HOKKAI SEISHI KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]); | [AD]DE2408304 (JUNG CLAUS); | [AD]GB1486079 (WIGGINS TEAPE LTD); | [AD]GB1552853 (BANK OF ENGLAND); | [AD]EP0059056 | by applicant | DE2408304 | GB1486079 | GB1552853 | EP0059056 |