EP0234215 - Indexing device for a table and mitrebox saw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.02.1991 [1991/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Overseas AG Staedtle 36 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | [1988/29] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states Eugen Lutz GmbH & Co. Maschinenfabrik Pinacher Strasse D-75417 Mühlacker / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergler, Otto Jahnstrasse 18/1 D-7130 Mphlacker-Lomersheim / DE | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Wilhelm, Hans-Herbert, Dr.-Ing., et al Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte Hospitalstrasse 8 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100368.7 | 14.01.1987 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | DE19863606524 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3606524 | [1987/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234215 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234215 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B27B5/29 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
B27B5/165 (EP);
B23D47/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/36] | Title | German: | Rasteinrichtung für eine Tisch- und Gehrungssäge | [1987/36] | English: | Indexing device for a table and mitrebox saw | [1987/36] | French: | Index pour une scie de table et d'onglets | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 10.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1628992 [ ] (LUTZ KG MASCHF EUGEN) |