EP0230269 - Vehicle sun-visor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1989 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Happich GmbH Postfach 10 02 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | [1987/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viertel, Lothar Jutta v. Hattsteinstrasse 41 D-6636 Berus Überherrn / DE | 02 /
Ebert, Charles 7. Rue du Parc F-70300 Luxeuil / FR | 03 /
Krehl, Hermann Hebelweg 9 D-7570 Baden-Baden / DE | 04 /
Hilbert, Bernard 526 Rue de la Forèt F-57450 Cappel / FR | 05 /
Walter, Rüdiger An den Martinsgärten 8 D-6802 Ladenburg / DE | [1987/31] | Application number, filing date | 87100440.4 | 15.01.1987 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | DE19863601762 | 22.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3601762 | [1987/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230269 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230269 | Date: | 04.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60J3/02 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
B60J3/023 (EP,US);
B60J3/0265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/31] | Title | German: | Sonnenblende für Fahrzeuge | [1987/31] | English: | Vehicle sun-visor | [1987/31] | French: | Pare-soleil pour véhicules | [1987/31] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 25.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 18.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/49] | 30.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2167556 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [A]EP0053529 (MECANISMES COMP IND DE [FR]); | [A]FR2548100 (HAPPICH GMBH GEBR [DE]); | [A]FR2554765 (AUTOPART SWEDEN AB [SE]) |