EP0230918 - Subterranean soil drainage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYDROGEO 1, Place des Platanes F-71150 Fontaines / FR | [1987/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gress, Jean-Claude 1, Place des Platanes F-71150 Fontaines / FR | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet François Hagry 3, rue de Genève 74100 Annemasse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet François Hagry 3, rue de Genève F-74100 Annemasse / FR | ||
Former [1991/20] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/32] | Hagry, François 52, avenue de la Gare F-74100 Annemasse / FR | Application number, filing date | 87100467.7 | 15.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | FR19860000899 | 20.01.1986 Original published format: FR 8600899 | [1987/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230918 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230918 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230918 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E02D19/10, E02D3/10 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
E02D19/10 (EP,US);
E02D3/10 (EP,US);
Y10T137/2842 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum unterirdischen Entwässern von Böden | [1987/32] | English: | Subterranean soil drainage device | [1987/32] | French: | Dispositif pour drainer des sols en profondeur | [1987/32] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 08.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 14.11.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 23.04.1991 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR737965 ; | [A]GB2018552 (WORLD SEIKO KK) | Examination | FR434699 |