EP0235513 - Alkaline plaster-mix with guar derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweizer, Dieter, Dr. Achenbachstrasse 7 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | 02 /
Engelskirchen, Konrad, Dr. Gonellastrasse 24 D-4005 Meerbusch 3 / DE | 03 /
Grünberger, Eberhard, Dr. Gustav-Mahler-Strasse 12 D-4010 Hilden / DE | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100495.8 | 16.01.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | DE19863602151 | 24.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3602151 | [1987/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235513 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235513 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235513 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/38 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B24/383 (EP);
C08B37/0096 (EP);
C04B2103/46 (EP);
C04B2111/00517 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B24/383 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Alkalische Gipsmischung mit Guarderivaten | [1987/37] | English: | Alkaline plaster-mix with guar derivatives | [1987/37] | French: | Mélange alcalin de plâtre avec des dérivés de guar | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4028127 (MASKE FRED JOHN, et al); | [A]EP0162544 (HERCULES INC [US]) |