EP0275334 - System for monitoring material dispensed onto a subtrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states NORDSON CORPORATION 555 Jackson Street P. O. Box 151 Amherst Ohio 44001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merkel, Stephen L. 380 Oakmoor Bay Village Ohio 44140 / US | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 D-28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100654.0 | 20.01.1987 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275334 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275334 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/88, B05C5/00 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
C23C14/52 (EP);
G01J1/42 (EP);
G05D5/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/30] | Title | German: | System zum Erfassen von Material auf einem Substrat | [1988/30] | English: | System for monitoring material dispensed onto a subtrate | [1988/30] | French: | Système de contrôle de matériaux dispensés sur une couche inférieure | [1988/30] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 11.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   05.03.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP55164316 ; | [X]US3067646 (JORGEN REESEN); | [A]US3380431 (KEYES MARION A, et al); | [A]FR2201763 (QUILCAILLE JACQUES [FR]); | [A]EP0154441 (BRITISH UNITED SHOE MACHINERY [GB], et al) |