EP0230308 - Peat harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.1991 | Refusal of application | published on 15.05.1991 [1991/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entreprises Premier CDN Ltee. 454, Chemin Témiscouata C.P. 2600 Rivière-du-Loup Québec G5R 4C9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states Entreprises Premier CDN Ltee. 454, Chemin Témiscouata C.P. 2600 Rivière-du-Loup Québec G5R 4C9 / CA | ||
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states Bélanger, Bernard 1403 - 4e Avenue La Pocatière Quebec / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bélanger, Bernhard 1403 - 4e Avenue La Pocatière Quebec / CA | [1988/46] |
Former [1987/31] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Patentanwälte Schroeter-Fleuchaus-Lehmann & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Fleuchaus & Wehser Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100730.8 | 20.01.1987 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | CA19860499921 | 20.01.1986 Original published format: CA 499921 | [1987/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230308 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E21C49/00 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
E21C49/00 (EP,US);
E02F3/92 (EP,US);
Y10S56/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1987/31] | Title | German: | Torferntemaschine | [1987/31] | English: | Peat harvester | [1987/31] | French: | Récolteuse de tourbe | [1987/31] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 16.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/20] | 17.12.1990 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2148748 (TURVERUUKKI OY); | [Y]US3728851 (VAN ANTWERP F); | [A]US4136508 (COLEMAN MARTIN W, et al); | [A]US4408404 (LATIMER JOHN P [US]); | [A]DE1482847 (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV); | [A]US4229931 (SCHLUETER FRANCIS E, et al) |