EP0230314 - Radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Satoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Hosoi, Yuichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Kenji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co. Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/31] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100802.5 | 21.01.1987 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | JP19860011297 | 21.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1129786 | JP19860309758 | 27.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30975886 | [1987/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0230314 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0230314 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230314 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1987/31] | Title | German: | Schirm zum Speichern eines Strahlungsbildes | [1987/31] | English: | Radiation image storage panel | [1987/31] | French: | Ecran pour l'enregistrement d'une image obtenue par rayonnement | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 06.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPD]EP0188274 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) |