EP0230987 - One-way clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chubu Bearing Kabushiki Kaisha 20-13, Nishihioki 2 chome Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/28] | For all designated states Chubu Bearing Kabushiki Kaisha 20-13, Nishihioki 2 chome Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454 / JP | ||
Former [1987/32] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Chubu Bearing Seisakusho 20-13, Nishihioki 2 chome Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 454 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Kouichi Chubu Bearing Seisakusho 20-13, Nishihioki 2 chome Nakagawa-ku Nagoya-shi AICHI 454 / JP | [1987/32] | Representative(s) | von Raffay, Vincenz, et al Patentanwälte Raffay & Fleck Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/32] | von Raffay, Vincenz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Raffay, Fleck & Partner Postfach 32 32 17 D-20117 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87100870.2 | 22.01.1987 | [1987/32] | Priority number, date | JP19860017858 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: JP 1785886 | [1987/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0230987 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0230987 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16D41/06 | [1987/32] | CPC: |
F16D41/067 (EP,US);
F16D13/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/32] | Title | German: | Freilaufkupplung | [1990/35] | English: | One-way clutch | [1987/32] | French: | Embrayages à roue libre | [1987/32] |
Former [1987/32] | Ein-Richtungs-Kupplung | Examination procedure | 12.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 12.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2117066 (TOK BEARING CO LTD); | [Y]US1927060 (BALLARD MILTON H); | [Y]FR2151767 (PARIS & DU RHONE); | [X]US3174598 (MATTSON RICHARD W); | [X]FR1287491 (RENAULT); | [X]FR2089973 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [X]FR2091149 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK); | [X]US2843238 (ROZNER JOSEPH J); | [X]GB2130312 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [A]FR2305640 (TORRINGTON CO [US]); | [A]FR1204030 (FORD); | [A]US3339687 (COWLES JOHN H); | [A]US3750593 (ZETTERLUND S); | [A]US3885544 (PFEIFFER PETER W); | [A]DE1450161 (LUCAS INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2552495 (PARIS & DU RHONE [FR]) |