EP0233507 - Supporting device for horizontally and vertically adjustable data display units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 D-64295 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brähler, Manfred Am Fronhof 20 D-6402 Grossenlüder / DE | 02 /
Noll, Erwin Gartenstrasse 24 D-6418 Hünfeld / DE | 03 /
Rousek, Heinz Wartburgring 4 D-6418 Hünfeld / DE | [1987/35] | Application number, filing date | 87100908.0 | 23.01.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | DE19863602549 | 29.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3602549 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233507 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/04 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
F16M11/08 (EP,US);
F16M11/24 (EP,US);
Y10S248/919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Tragen von horizontal und vertikal verstellbaren Informationsgeräten | [1987/35] | English: | Supporting device for horizontally and vertically adjustable data display units | [1987/35] | French: | Dispositif de support pour appareils de présentation d'informations à réglage horizontal et vertical | [1987/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/35] | 09.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3415497 (LEYMANN FRIEDHELM [DE]); | [Y]FR2373103 (NAESS TURE [SE]); | [Y]DE3217431 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2562979 (YINGLING CLINTON R); | [A]GB464856 (QUARZLAMPEN GMBH); | [A]GB2081362 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, et al) |