EP0232844 - Front loader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMillan, John Ross 569 Sumler Road Rural Route 5 Welland Ontario L3C 3H6 / CA | 02 /
Kizlyk, Merv Peter 10 Sherwood Forest Trail Welland Ontario L3C 3N3 / CA | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1987/40] |
Former [1987/34] | Sartorius, Peter DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department Postfach 503 Steubenstrasse 36-42 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101488.2 | 04.02.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860827347 | 07.02.1986 Original published format: US 827347 | [1987/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232844 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/42, E02F3/40, E02F3/34 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
E02F3/422 (EP);
E02F3/404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Frontlader | [1987/34] | English: | Front loader | [1987/34] | French: | Pelle mécanique | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/41] | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2132901 ; | [X]DE1456439 ; | [X]DE3233581 ; | [X]DE3216507 ; | [X]US4371307 ; | [X]US3139199 (AUWELAER ALBERT J VAN) |