EP0277258 - Device for transporting and accumulating pallets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/32] | Method for transporting and accumulating pallets and rolling track for transporting and accumulating same | ||
[1990/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states CARL SCHENCK AG D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunstmann, Uwe, Dr. Taunusstrasse 79 D-6101 Rossdorf 1 / DE | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Dallhammer, Herbert Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101561.6 | 05.02.1987 | [1988/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277258 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277258 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/24, B65G47/26 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
B65G47/268 (EP,US);
B65G17/24 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/43] |
Former [1988/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport und zum Aufstauen von Paletten | [1990/35] | English: | Device for transporting and accumulating pallets | [1990/35] | French: | Dispositif pour transporter et accumuler des palettes | [1990/35] |
Former [1988/32] | Verfahren zum Transport und zum Aufstauen von Paletten sowie Transport- und Staurollenbahn | ||
Former [1988/32] | Method for transporting and accumulating pallets and rolling track for transporting and accumulating same | ||
Former [1988/32] | Procédé pour transporter et accumuler des palettes ainsi que chemin de roulement pour transporter et accumuler | Examination procedure | 25.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 08.02.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, GR, LU, NL | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.02.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 05.02.1988 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 05.02.1988 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 05.02.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 05.02.1988 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3197020 (EVANS DEWEY M, et al); | [A]DE2210341 (GIANETTI SPA) |