blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0247280

EP0247280 - Hooking device between wings and frames of windows, doors or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  29.03.1996
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Eisenhüttenstrasse 22
57074 Siegen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/49]For all designated states
SIEGENIA-FRANK KG
Eisenhüttenstrasse 22
D-57074 Siegen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Schneider, Alfred
Roonstrasse 18
D-5901 Kreuztal / DE
[1987/49]
Application number, filing date87101564.005.02.1987
[1987/49]
Priority number, dateDE19860014557U30.05.1986         Original published format: DE 8614557 U
[1987/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0247280
Date:02.12.1987
Language:DE
[1987/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0247280
Date:11.04.1990
Language:DE
[1990/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.1987
ClassificationIPC:E05C9/18, E05C21/02
[1987/49]
CPC:
E05C9/18 (EP); E05B15/1614 (EP); E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05C9/185 (EP); E05C9/063 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/49]
TitleGerman:Verhakungsvorrichtung zwischen dem Flügel und dem feststehenden Rahmen von Fenstern, Türen od.dgl.[1987/49]
English:Hooking device between wings and frames of windows, doors or the like[1987/49]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage entre l'aile et le cadre fixe de fenêtres, portes ou similaires[1987/49]
Examination procedure16.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/07]
08.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.09.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1989Fee for grant paid
29.09.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.12.1990  24.01.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding
F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll, et al, et al
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 02  10.01.1991  19.02.1991  ADMISSIBLE
ROTO FRANK AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmid, Berthold
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1995/01]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.1990  24.01.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding
F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
 02  10.01.1991  19.02.1991  ADMISSIBLE
ROTO FRANK AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Opponent's representative
Schmid, Berthold, Dipl.-Ing.
Kohler Schmid + Partner Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
D-70565 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1991/10]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.1990   
Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding
F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
 02  10.01.1991   
ROTO FRANK AG
Postfach 10 01 58
D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE
Former [1991/08]
Opponent(s)01  17.12.1990    ADMISSIBLE
Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment
2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding
F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner, et al, et al
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
22.02.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.08.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.08.1991Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
06.03.1992Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
29.10.1992Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
22.06.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
09.03.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
22.11.1995Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/20]
Appeal following opposition20.04.1994Appeal received No.  T0363/94
11.07.1994Statement of grounds filed
22.11.1995Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
22.11.1995Date of oral proceedings
29.11.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [2000/52]CH11.04.1990
LI11.04.1990
Documents cited:SearchDE2035026  [ ]
Examination   - BAUBESCHLAGMAGAZIN, Heft 3/1985, S. 58; Heft 5/1985, S. 108, S. 113
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.