EP0233556 - Sound-absorbing false ceiling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelmi Werke GmbH & Co.KG Postfach 55 35631 Lahnau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states Wilhelmi Werke GmbH & Co.KG Postfach 55 D-35631 Lahnau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feht, Friedrich, Dipl.-Holzwirt Helgebachstrasse 65 D-6330 Wetzlar / DE | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Missling, Arne, et al Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | Missling, Arne, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Bismarckstrasse 43 D-35390 Giessen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101582.2 | 05.02.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | DE19863604246 | 11.02.1986 Original published format: DE 3604246 | [1987/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233556 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233556 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233556 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/04 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
E04B9/0435 (EP);
E04B9/001 (EP);
E04B9/0464 (EP);
E04B9/16 (EP);
E04B9/245 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/35] | E04B5/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1987/35] | Title | German: | Schallschluckende Unterdecke | [1987/35] | English: | Sound-absorbing false ceiling | [1987/35] | French: | Faux plafond antibruit | [1987/35] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 16.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1778412 (BALDUF BRUNO E); | [A]FR744204 ; | [A]US2070150 (VENZIE FREDERICK M); | [A]FR1483017 ; | [A]US3656577 (LARSSON INGEMAR, et al); | [A]DE2652481 (SEIFFERT JOACHIM); | [A]DE3214291 (WENGER HANS) |