EP0236758 - Structural elements containing wood chips, in particular plaster boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rigips GmbH Rühler Strasse D-37619 Bodenwerder / DE | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rennen, Heinz, Dr. Junkergrund D-3452 Bodenwerder / DE | 02 /
Hilscher, Gerald, Dipl.-Ing. Schillerstrasse 51 D-3280 Bad Pyrmont / DE | 03 /
* * * | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Rücker, Wolfgang Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Rücker, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101702.6 | 07.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | DE19863608581 | 14.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3608581 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236758 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236758 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236758 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/26, C04B28/14, C04B41/65, B32B13/02, B32B13/08, B32B13/14, E04C2/26, // (C04B28/14, 14:42, 18:26, 18:28, 20:00, 28:02) | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B18/26 (EP);
C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B41/508 (EP);
C04B41/65 (EP);
E04C2/043 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B18/26, C04B18/28, C04B20/0008, C04B20/04 (EP);
C04B28/14, C04B7/32, C04B14/42, C04B18/26, C04B41/5007, C04B41/508 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B28/14 (EP);
C04B41/508, C04B41/46, C04B41/5007 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Bauteile enthaltend Holzspäne, insbesondere Platten aus Gips | [1987/38] | English: | Structural elements containing wood chips, in particular plaster boards | [1987/38] | French: | Eléments de construction contenant des copeaux de bois, en particulier des carreaux de plâtre | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 10.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 16.10.1991 | ES | 27.01.1992 | LU | 29.02.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 16.10.1991 | |
LU | 29.02.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | LU | 29.02.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SA7004896 ; | [A]CH239957 (BEIJERINCK MARTINUS GIJSBERTUS [NL]); | [A]AT175200B (STULZ WALTER, et al); | [A]GB781315 (ELMENDORF ARMIN); | [AD]DE1571466 (FENZ DR ERWIN); | [AD]DE2919311 (KOSSATZ GERT PROF DR-ING HABIL) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS. Band 77, Nr. 6, 7 August 1972, Seite 133, Abstract Nr. 36682c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SA-A-70 04896, 18-10-1971, & SA7004896 A 00000000 |