EP0236762 - Multiprocessor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueda, Hirotada 22-49, Nishimachi-2-chome Kokubunji-shi / JP | 02 /
Kato, Kanji 5297-5-4, Oaza Yamaguchi Tokorozawa-shi / JP | 03 /
Matsushima, Hitoshi 13-18, Sunagawacho-1-chome Tachikawa-shi / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101820.6 | 10.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860051236 | 08.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5123686 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236762 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236762 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/66, G06F15/16 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G06F15/8015 (EP,US);
G06T1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/38] | Title | German: | Multiprozessorsystem | [1987/38] | English: | Multiprocessor system | [1987/38] | French: | Système à multiprocesseur | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 07.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0014926 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]); | [A]GB2137847 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG); | [A]US4524455 (HOLSZTYNSKI WLODZIMIERZ [US], et al); | [AD]EP0147857 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |