EP0232910 - Methods for preparing advanced epoxy or phenoxy resins with low aliphatic halide content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Dow Chemical Company 2020 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Chun S. 109 Rose Trail Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | 02 /
Bowden, Robert L. 20 Ranch House Loop Angleton Texas 77515 / US | 03 /
Chen, Wuu N. 307 Mimosa Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | [1990/17] |
Former [1987/34] | 01 /
Wang, Chun S. 109 Rose Trail Lake Jackson Texas 77566 / US | ||
02 /
Bowden, Robert L. 20 Ranch House Loop Angleton Texas 77515 / US | |||
03 /
Chen, Wuu N. 307 Mimosa Lake Jackson texas 77566 / US | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101910.5 | 11.02.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860829362 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: US 829362 | US19860911197 | 24.09.1986 Original published format: US 911197 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232910 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232910 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0232910 | Date: | 05.07.1990 | [1990/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/02, C08G59/08, C07D303/24 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
C08G59/066 (EP,US);
C08G59/00 (KR);
C08G59/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Epoxy- oder Phenoxyharzen mit niedrigem aliphatischem Halogenidgehalt | [1987/34] | English: | Methods for preparing advanced epoxy or phenoxy resins with low aliphatic halide content | [1987/34] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de résines époxydes ou phénoxydes avec une faible teneur en halogène aliphatique | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.03.1987 | ES   M02   Fee paid on   27.04.1987 | 11.03.1987 | GR   M02   Fee paid on   27.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0018040 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [A]US4250100 (BERTRAM JAMES L [US], et al); | [A]US4394496 (SCHRADER PAUL G); | [A]EP0125454 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]US4485221 (KRUEGER ULF A [US], et al); | [AP]US4585838 (WANG CHUN S [US], et al) |