Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] |
27.03.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
08.06.1989 | First examination report | |
25.02.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] |
04.07.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.08.1987 [1987/34] |