EP0237790 - Honing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Gehring GmbH & Co. Gehringstrasse 28 D-73760 Ostfildern / DE | [1987/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Flurstrasse 22 D-7012 Fellbach / DE | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Jackisch, Walter Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | Jackisch, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Menzelstrasse 40 D-70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 87101972.5 | 12.02.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | DE19863607580 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3607580 | [1987/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237790 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237790 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B24B33/10, B24B55/02 | [1987/39] | CPC: |
B24B33/10 (EP,US);
B24B55/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/39] | Title | German: | Honeinrichtung | [1987/39] | English: | Honing device | [1987/39] | French: | Dispositif de rodage | [1987/39] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 02.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2733562 ; | [A]US3153885 (KELLER CHAUNCEY A R, et al); | [A]US3605348 (MCCLURE CHARLES W); | [A]DE2521149 (GEHRING KG MASCHF); | [A]FR2444113 (VOITH GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE3307555 (GUEHRING GOTTLIEB [DE]); | [Y]DE3336626 (NAGEL PETER, et al) |