EP0233619 - High molecular compounds having amino groups, and their utilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON-MEDI PHYSICS CO., LTD. No 4-2-1, Takatsukasa Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1987/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurami, Miki c/o Sumitomo Kagaku Anegasaki Shataku 314 9 Yushudainishi 1-chome Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Shirakami, Yoshifumi Hirobe Haitsu 2-D No. 4085 Goi Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Takahashi, Keietsu c/o Sumitomo Kagaku Kamiwaseda Shataku 6105 No. 135 Iriyamazu Ichihara-shi Chiba-ken / JP | 04 /
Ueda, Nobuo 11-14, Nagauraekimae 2-chome Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102123.4 | 14.02.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | JP19860031622 | 14.02.1986 Original published format: JP 3162286 | JP19860315089 | 31.12.1986 Original published format: JP 31508986 | [1987/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0233619 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233619 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/02 | [1987/35] | CPC: |
A61K51/065 (EP,US);
A61K47/59 (EP,US);
A61K47/645 (EP,US);
A61K47/6883 (EP,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,US);
A61K2121/00 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US);
Y10S530/811 (EP,US);
Y10S530/812 (EP,US);
Y10S530/816 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Aminogruppen enthaltende hochmolekulare Verbindungen und deren Verwendung | [1987/35] | English: | High molecular compounds having amino groups, and their utilization | [1987/35] | French: | Composés aminés de haut poids moléculaire et leur utilisation | [1987/35] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0150844 (ENZO BIOCHEM INC [US]); | [A]EP0131361 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0103049 (NIHON MEDIPHYSICS CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 8, July 1981, page 2677, column 2, abstract no. 2677m, Columbus, Ohio, US; MOTOHASHI et al.: "Labeling reactions of L-lysine and poly-L-lysine with cobalt-57 and their distribution in normal and Ehrlich ascites tumor-bearing mice"; & RADIOISOTOPES 1981, 30 (2), 80-85 | [A] - JOURNAL OF NUCLEAR MEDICINE, vol. 23, no. 10, 1982, pages 909-914, New York, US; ARIRA YOKOYAMA et al.: "Deferoxamine, a promising bifunctional chelating agent for labeling proteins with gallium: Ga-67 DF-HAS: concise communication" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 82, no. 17, 28th April 1975, page 388, column 2, abstract no. 117473r, Columbus, Ohio, US; BEYER et al.: "Chemical effects connected with various processes of radioactive decay of cerium isotopes in complexes with polyamine-polycarboxylate chelate ligands"; & NUCL. SCI. ABST. 1974, 30 (8) 20786 |