EP0233622 - Process for manufacturing hydroxyl amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/35] | Process for manufacturing hydroxyl amines, and compounds so obtained | ||
[1991/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEROX Société Anonyme Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/35] | For all designated states INTEROX Société Anonyme Rue du Prince Albert, 33 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legrand, Franz Rue des Vaches, 71 B-7300 Quaregnon / BE | 02 /
Deschrijver, Paul Jan Dekinderstraat, 63 B-1730 Asse-Zellik / BE | [1987/35] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/35] | Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102147.3 | 16.02.1987 | [1987/35] | Priority number, date | FR19860002217 | 17.02.1986 Original published format: FR 8602217 | [1987/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0233622 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0233622 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0233622 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C239/08 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
C07C239/08 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/35] | C07C83/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylaminen | [1991/26] | English: | Process for manufacturing hydroxyl amines | [1991/26] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'hydroxylamines | [1991/26] |
Former [1987/35] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Hydroxylaminen und so erhaltene Produkte | ||
Former [1987/35] | Process for manufacturing hydroxyl amines, and compounds so obtained | ||
Former [1987/35] | Procédé pour la fabrication d'hydroxylamines et produits ainsi obtenus | Examination procedure | 08.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.06.1991 | SE | 26.06.1991 | ES | 07.10.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1992/15] | AT | 26.06.1991 | |
SE | 26.06.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | SE | 26.06.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3243462 (SMITH HERBERT Q) |