EP0235677 - Printing blanket with carrier plate and method of assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company 3075 Highland Parkway Downers Grove, IL 60515-1261 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company 2223 Martin Luther King Drive Chicago Illinois 60616 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wouch, Gerald L. 634 Aster Ct. Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | 02 /
Procknow, Gary 12712 South Escanaba Chicago Illinois 60633 / US | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/37] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102310.7 | 18.02.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | US19860836766 | 06.03.1986 Original published format: US 836766 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235677 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235677 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B41F7/22 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
B41F30/04 (EP,US);
Y10S428/909 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Drucktuch mit Tragplatte und Verfahren zum Zusammenbau | [1987/37] | English: | Printing blanket with carrier plate and method of assembly | [1987/37] | French: | Blanchet d'impression avec plaque de support et procédé d'assemblage | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 22.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59209199 ; | [Y]JP59209198 ; | [Y]US2271125 (JUVE ARTHUR E); | [XD]US2982207 (REIDAR STROMME); | [X]US3387074 (HILL EDWARD D); | [X]DE2530355 (TRAUTMANN ROLAND); | [Y]US4015046 (PINKSTON MELVIN D, et al); | [XD]US4040351 (FAUST HANS B); | [Y]FR2352675 (IND ELECTRONIC RUBBER [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 80 (M-370)[1803], 10th April 1985; & JP-A-59 209 199 (SUMITOMO GOMU KOGYO K.K.) 27-11-1984, & JP59209199 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 80 (M-370)[1803], 10th April 1985; & JP-A-59 209 198 (SUMITOMO GOMU KOGYO K.K.) 27-11-1984, & JP59209198 A 00000000 |