EP0247288 - Filter press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVK Filtration Systems GmbH Obere Lerch 2 91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | For all designated states JV KUNSTSTOFFWERK GMBH Obere Lerch 2 D-91166 Georgensgmünd / DE | ||
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states Hansen-BTR GmbH Geleitstrasse 11 b D-6450 Hanau 8 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neu, Werner Dr. Gieseckenkamp 24 D-3012 Langenhagen / DE | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Keil, Rainer A., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN, Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1989/48] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1988/48] | Keil, Rainer A., Dipl.-Phys. Dr. KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Eysseneckstrasse 31 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 1 / DE | ||
Former [1988/43] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1987/49] | Junius, Walther, Dr. Wolfstrasse 24 D-30519 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102513.6 | 23.02.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | DE19863617651 | 26.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3617651 | [1987/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0247288 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0247288 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247288 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/12 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
B01D25/215 (EP,US);
B01D25/285 (EP,US);
B01D25/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/49] | Title | German: | Filterpresse | [1987/49] | English: | Filter press | [1987/49] | French: | Filtre-presse | [1987/49] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 09.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.01.1990 | IT | 24.01.1990 | CH | 28.02.1990 | LI | 28.02.1990 | ES | 05.05.1990 | [2007/52] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 24.01.1990 | |
IT | 24.01.1990 | ||
CH | 28.02.1990 | ||
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
ES | 05.05.1990 | ||
Former [2004/03] | IT | 24.01.1990 | |
CH | 28.02.1990 | ||
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
ES | 05.05.1990 | ||
FR | 15.06.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.01.1990 | |
CH | 28.02.1990 | ||
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
FR | 15.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/26] | CH | 28.02.1990 | |
LI | 28.02.1990 | ||
FR | 15.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/09] | CH | 28.02.1990 | |
LI | 28.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2110104 (KENYON JACK) |