EP0236832 - Device for the floating guiding of material webs by means of a gas or a liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORK CONTIWEB B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 43a 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states STORK CONTIWEB B.V. Wim de Körverstraat 43a NL-5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states Vits, Hilmar Hüschelrath 16 D-42799 Leichlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/38] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 87102555.7 | 24.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | DE19863607370 | 06.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3607370 | [1987/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236832 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236832 | Date: | 15.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65H20/14, B65H23/24 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
B65H23/24 (EP,US);
B65H2406/112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum schwebenden Führen von Materialbahnen mittels eines gasförmigen oder flüssigen Mediums | [1987/38] | English: | Device for the floating guiding of material webs by means of a gas or a liquid | [1987/38] | French: | Dispositif pour le guidage flottant de bandes de matière au moyen d'un gaz ou d'un liquide | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/05] | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1395604 ; | [A]DE2120805 ; | [AD]US3957187 (PUIGRODON JAMES) |