Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE67873T | 15.10.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 | EP87102726 | 26.02.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0235745 | Global Dossier | 25.09.1991 | B1 | EP0235745 | 27.07.1988 | A3 | EP0235745 | 09.09.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CH669684 | 31.03.1989 | A5 | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3773229D1 | 31.10.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2632155B | 23.07.1997 | B2 | JPS62211790 | 17.09.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4739701 | 26.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | CH90586 | 05.03.1986 |