EP0235745 - Postage meter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMA AG Postfach 3438 Lauperswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states FRAMA AG Postfach CH-3438 Lauperswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haug, Werner Oberstrasse 12 CH-3550 Langnau im Emmental / CH | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Quehl, Horst Max Patentanwalt Ringstrasse 7 Postfach 223 8274 Tägerwilen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Quehl, Horst Max Patentanwalt Ringstrasse 7 Postfach 223 8274 Tägerwillen / CH | ||
Former [1987/37] | Quehl, Horst Max, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 104 Ringstrasse 7 CH-8274 Tägerwilen / CH | Application number, filing date | 87102726.4 | 26.02.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | CH19860000905 | 05.03.1986 Original published format: CH 90586 | [1987/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235745 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235745 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235745 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00, B41K3/12 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
B41F27/10 (EP,US);
B41K3/12 (EP,US);
G07B17/00508 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00548 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/37] | G07B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Frankiermaschine | [1987/37] | English: | Postage meter | [1987/37] | French: | Machine à affranchir | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1561355 (GUHL & SCHEIBLER AG); | [A]US4143597 (KESTEN MARTIN, et al); | [A]DE3407633 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [AD]DE2932426 |