EP0240693 - Fuel injector for internal-combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eblen, Ewald, Dr. Fridinger Strasse 53 D-7000 Stuttgart 75 / DE | 02 /
Füssner, Paul, Dipl.-Ing. Sommerhofenstrasse 167 D-7032 Sindelfingen / DE | 03 /
Hofmann, Karl Amselweg 22 D-7148 Remseck 1 / DE | 04 /
Kapolke, Günter Oberer Geisberg 5 D-8618 Geisfeld / DE | 05 /
Schneider, Edgar Leipoldstrasse 15 D-8729 Knetzgau / DE | 06 /
Straubel, Max, Dr. Antariostrasse 30B D-7000 Stuttgart 61 / DE | 07 /
Wagner, Werner Silcherstrasse 11 D-7016 Gerlingen / DE | 08 /
Wolf, Klaus Rusenschlossstrasse 17 D-7000 Stuttgart 30 / DE | [1987/42] | Application number, filing date | 87102772.8 | 26.02.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863611316 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611316 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240693 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240693 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F02M45/08, F02M61/16 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
F02M61/205 (EP);
F02M45/08 (EP);
F02M61/161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/42] | Title | German: | Kraftstoff-Einspritzdüse für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1987/42] | English: | Fuel injector for internal-combustion engines | [1987/42] | French: | Injecteur de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 29.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1110102 (RUSTON & HORNSBY LTD); | [A]DE2704688 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [AD]DE2711902 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]GB2086473 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |