EP0235772 - Curable vinyl ester resins modified by an elastomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1992 [1992/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roland, Peter, Dr. Wildermuthstrasse 33 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1987/37] | Application number, filing date | 87102871.8 | 28.02.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | DE19863606950 | 04.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3606950 | [1987/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235772 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235772 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235772 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08L63/10, C08F299/02, C08G59/04, C08G59/17 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
C08L63/10 (EP);
C08G59/04 (EP);
C08G59/1472 (EP);
C08G65/3326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/37] | Title | German: | Elastomermodifizierte, härtbare Vinylesterharze | [1987/37] | English: | Curable vinyl ester resins modified by an elastomer | [1987/37] | French: | Résine ester vinylique durcissable modifiée par un élastomère | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 17.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2916396 (DOW CHEMICAL CO); | [A]EP0065020 (DOW CHEMICAL RHEINWERK GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0079227 (SCOTT BADER CO [GB]) |