EP0238893 - Recombinant parvovirus RA-1 products and methods of use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago Illinois 60064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simpson, Robert Wayne 261 Amwell Road Neshanic New Jersey 08853 / US | 02 /
VanLeeuwen, Donald Hugh 1936 Poplar Street Waukegan Illinois 60087 / US | 03 /
Smith, Robert Eldon 36567 N. Grandwood Drive Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | 04 /
Lawrie, Dawson Keiss 1114-35th Street Downers Grove Illinois 60515 / US | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/40] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87102923.7 | 02.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | US19860841905 | 20.03.1986 Original published format: US 841905 | [1987/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0238893 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0238893 | Date: | 14.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0238893 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/70, A61K39/23, C12Q1/70, G01N33/569, C07K15/00 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP);
C12Q1/701 (EP);
C12N2750/14322 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/40] | C12N15/00, A61K39/23, C12Q1/70, G01N33/569 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT [1987/40] | Title | German: | Rekombinante Parvovirus-RA-1-Produkte und Verfahren zu deren Anwendung | [1987/40] | English: | Recombinant parvovirus RA-1 products and methods of use thereof | [1987/40] | French: | Produits du parvovirus RA-1 recombinant, et procédés d'utilisation de ceux-ci | [1987/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Request for further processing for: | 28.01.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 28.01.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.02.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 28.10.1992 | IT | 28.10.1992 | BE | 31.03.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/25] | DE | 28.10.1992 | |
BE | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/28] | DE | 28.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - SCIENCE, vol. 223, 30th March 1984, pages 1425-1428; R.W. SIMPSON et al.: "Association of Parvoviruses with rheumatoid arthritis of humans" | [YD] - SCIENCE, vol. 226, 7th December 1984, pages 1161-1165; S.F. COTMORE et al.: "Characterization and molecular cloning of a human parvovirus genome" | [XP] - BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 5, no. 10, October 1987, pages 1077-1080, New York, US; W.P. SISK et al.: "Expression of human parvovirus B19 structural protein in E. Coli and detection of antiviral antibodies in human serum" | [PO] - ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, May 1986, vol. 86, no. 0, page 316, no. S-42, American Society for Microbiology, US; D.K. LAWRIE et al.: "Cloning and in-vitro expression of parvovirus RA-1 DNA in Escherichia-Coli" | [A] - THE LANCET, 23rd February 1985, pages 422-425; D.M. REID et al.: "Human parvovirus-associated arthritis: a clinical and laboratory description" | [A] - VIROLOGY, vol. 134, no. 1, 1984, pages 64-71, Academic Press, Inc.; B. GEORG-FRIES et al.: "Analysis of proteins, helper dependence, and seroepidemiology of a new human parvovirus" | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, vol. 15, no. 2, 1985, pages 173-181, Alan R. Liss, Inc.; J.P. CLEWLEY: "Detection of human paravovirus using a molecularly cloned probe" |