EP0236942 - 2'-Deamino-2'-hydroxyistamycin Bo derivatives of low toxicity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAIDAN HOJIN BISEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYU KAI 14-23, Kami Osaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states ZAIDAN HOJIN BISEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYU KAI 14-23, Kami Osaki 3-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Umezawa, Hamao 23, Toyotama Kita 4-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okami, Yoshiro 18-14, Denenchofu 4-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kondo, Shinichi 1157-1, Ichigao-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Daishiro 29-8, Yoyogi 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103107.6 | 05.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860051557 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5155786 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236942 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236942 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236942 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/224, A61K31/70 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C07H15/224 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/38] | Title | German: | 2'-Deamino-2'-hydroxyistamycin-B-Derivate mit niedriger Toxizität | [1987/38] | English: | 2'-Deamino-2'-hydroxyistamycin Bo derivatives of low toxicity | [1987/38] | French: | Dérivés de la 2'-déamino-2'-hydroxyistamycine B à basse toxicité | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0096392 (KOWA CO [JP]) |