EP0235825 - Alkenylated toluenediamines for use in preparing polyurethane/urea systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. Route no. 222 Trexlertown Pennsylvania 18087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgoyne, William F. 1950 Potomac Street Allentown, PA 18103 / US | 02 /
Dixon, Dale D. RD No. 3, Box 337-35 Kutztown, PA 19530 / US | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103193.6 | 06.03.1987 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | US19860837461 | 07.03.1986 Original published format: US 837461 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235825 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235825 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C87/56 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
C08G18/675 (EP,US);
C08G18/676 (EP,US);
C08G18/8125 (EP,US);
C08G2120/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Alkenylierte Toluendiamine für Verwendung in Polyurethan/Harnstoff-Systeme | [1987/37] | English: | Alkenylated toluenediamines for use in preparing polyurethane/urea systems | [1987/37] | French: | Toluènediamines alkénylées pour usage dans la préparation de systèmes polyuréthane/urée | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.10.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2403963 (NELSON AXE WILLIAM); | [AD]DE1079628 (BAYER AG); | [AD]US3865889 (MITCHELL RICHARD E); | [E]EP0272650 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) |