EP0240736 - Ballast device or transformer, especially for discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vossloh Schwabe GmbH Wasenstrasse 25 73660 Urbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states Vossloh Schwabe GmbH Wasenstrasse 25 D-73660 Urbach / DE | ||
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states Vossloh Schwabe GmbH Wasenstrasse 25 Urbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103220.7 | 06.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863611070 | 03.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611070 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0240736 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240736 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/00, H01R33/94 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
H01R33/942 (EP);
H01F37/00 (KR);
H05B41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1987/42] | Title | German: | Vorschaltgerät oder Transformator, insbesondere für Entladungslampen | [1987/42] | English: | Ballast device or transformer, especially for discharge lamps | [1987/42] | French: | Ballast ou transformateur, plus particulièrement pour lampes à décharge | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 12.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3815080 (SUMMA F); | [X]FR2371073 (JONES IAN [GB]); | [X]US4316120 (COTMAN RONALD N, et al) |