EP0249683 - Locking device for window wings, doors or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.01.1994 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 57074 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | For all designated states SIEGENIA-FRANK KG Eisenhüttenstrasse 22 D-57074 Siegen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Alfred Roonstrasse 18 D-5901 Kreuztal / DE | [1987/52] | Application number, filing date | 87103249.6 | 06.03.1987 | [1987/52] | Priority number, date | DE19860016210U | 16.06.1986 Original published format: DE 8616210 U | [1987/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0249683 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0249683 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0249683 | Date: | 02.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/00, E05C9/04 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
E05C9/066 (EP);
E05C9/1808 (EP);
E05C9/185 (EP);
E05C19/028 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/52] | E05C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1987/52] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung für die Flügel von Fenstern, Türen od.dgl. | [1987/52] | English: | Locking device for window wings, doors or the like | [1987/52] | French: | Dispositif pour la fermeture de battants de fenêtres, de portes et similaires | [1987/52] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1990
14.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | 02
19.02.1990
23.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1990
14.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
02
19.02.1990
23.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE ROTO FRANK AG Postfach 10 01 58 D-70745 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | |||
Former [1990/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.02.1990
14.03.1990
ADMISSIBLE Ferco International Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment 2, rue du Vieux Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR Opponent's representative Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | 29.03.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.08.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.12.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2242958 [ ] (O'CONNOR JOHN B); | DE729326 [ ] (WALTER STEINRUECK); | AT369843B [ ] (MAYER & CO RIEGEL BESCHLAG [AT]); | DE3141243 [ ] (GEZE GMBH [DE]) |