EP0240754 - Aromatics recovery and transfer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chimel, Mark 300, Cotuit Road Sandwich, Ma 02563 / US | 02 /
Ghodsizadeh, Yousef 159 Highland Ave. Worthington, Oh 43085 / US | 03 /
Weitzenecker, Don 12303 Woodstock Urbana Pike Milford Center, Oh 43045 / US | 04 /
Yunker, Kenneth A. 17587 Echo Drive Marysville, Oh 43040 / US | [1987/42] | Application number, filing date | 87103337.9 | 09.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | US19860849487 | 08.04.1986 Original published format: US 849487 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240754 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240754 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0240754 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23F5/48, A23L1/221 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
A23F5/486 (EP);
A23F5/48 (KR);
A23L27/115 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Rückgewinnung und Übertragung von Aroma | [1987/42] | English: | Aromatics recovery and transfer | [1987/42] | French: | Récupération et transfert d'arômes | [1987/42] | Examination procedure | 09.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1204114 ; | [A]GB1062533 (KARL RICHARD LOBLICH); | [A]DE1492747 (MEYER FROEHLICH DR HANS); | [A]CH563792 (NESTLE SA) | Examination | - Food Process Engineering, AUI Publishing Company, Westport, Connecticut 1975 |