EP0237013 - Adaptive instruction processing by array processor having processor identification and data dependent status registers in each processing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Hungwen 60 Deerfield Lane South Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US | 02 /
Wang, Ching-Chy 6F Mountainview Knolls Fishkill, N.Y. 12524 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Burt, Roger James IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | Burt, Roger James, Dr. IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1991/02] | Killgren, Neil Arthur IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1988/50] | Grant, Iain Murray IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1988/42] | Blakemore, Frederick Norman IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | ||
Former [1987/38] | Teufel, Fritz, Dipl.-Phys. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103374.2 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | US19860839311 | 13.03.1986 Original published format: US 839311 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237013 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237013 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237013 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/44 | [1993/06] | CPC: |
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F15/8023 (EP,US);
G06F9/3887 (EP,US);
G06F9/4494 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/38] | G06F15/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/38] | Title | German: | Adaptive Befehlsverarbeitung durch Feldrechner mit Prozessoridentifikation und datenabhängigen Statusregistern in jedem Prozessorelement | [1987/38] | English: | Adaptive instruction processing by array processor having processor identification and data dependent status registers in each processing element | [1987/38] | French: | Traitement adaptatif d'instruction par processeur en réseau ayant une identification de processeur et des registres d'état, dépendant des données, dans chaque élément de processeur | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 26.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 26.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.02.1993 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3287702 (BORCK JR WALTER C, et al); | [X]EP0121763 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0200569 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]); | [XP]WO8607174 (SHEKELS HOWARD D) |