EP0243627 - Electro-deposited CoNiFe alloy for thin film heads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Nathaniel Carl P.O. Box 157 Pine Island, MN 55963 / US | 02 /
Chesnutt, Robert Blair 9724 Sierra East Tucson Arizona 85748 / US | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | Colas, Alain Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 87103378.3 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | US19860854451 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: US 854451 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243627 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0243627 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/56, H01F10/16 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
G11B5/3163 (EP,US);
C25D3/562 (EP,US);
H01F41/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/45] | Title | German: | Galvanisch abgeschiedene CoNiFe-Legierung für mit einem dünnen Film versehene Schreib-Lese-Köpfe | [1987/45] | English: | Electro-deposited CoNiFe alloy for thin film heads | [1987/45] | French: | Alliage du type Co-Ni-Fe électro-déposé pour têtes d'enregistrement revêtues d'un film mince | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/16] | 03.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3297418 (STANLEY FIRESTONE, et al); | [AD]US3533922 (SEMIENKO PETER P, et al); | [A]AU492399B ; | [A]GB1504078 (M & T CHEMICALS INC [US]) |