EP0237913 - Transcription effector sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/09] | For all designated states MILES INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | ||
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states MILES LABORATORIES, INC. 1127 Myrtle Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armilei, Genevieve 1107 Pine Street Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | 02 /
Yarger, James Gregory 1539 Evergreen Place Elkhart, IN 46514 / US | [1987/39] | Representative(s) | Dänner, Klaus, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Rechtspolitik Gewerblicher Rechtsschutz 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Dänner, Klaus, Dr., et al Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1987/39] | Jesse, Ralf-Rüdiger, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernverwaltung RP Lizenzen und technische Kooperationen D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103385.8 | 10.03.1987 | [1987/39] | Priority number, date | US19860842501 | 21.03.1986 Original published format: US 842501 | [1987/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237913 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N1/16, C12N1/18, // (C12N1/18, C12R1:865) | [1987/39] | CPC: |
C12N15/67 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/39] | Title | German: | Transkriptions-Effektor-Sequenzen | [1987/39] | English: | Transcription effector sequences | [1987/39] | French: | Séquences d'effecteur de transcription | [1987/39] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 24.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 10.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0164556 [ ]; | EP0154566 [ ] | [ ] - JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, vol. 170, 1983 (London, New York, San Francisco) M. ROSE et al. "Structure and Function of the Yeast URA 3 Gene; Differentially Regulated Expression of Hybrid b-Galactosidase from Overlapping Coding SequeNCES IN YEAST" PAGES 883-904 * PAGES 883, 884 * | [ ] - CELL, vol. 28, no. 3, March 1982 (Cambridge, Mass., USA) K.S. ZARET et al. "DNA Sequence Required for Efficient Transcription Termination in Yeast" pages 563-573 |