EP0237050 - Copy storing tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Susumu 11-2-302, Nagayoshidedo 8-chome Hirano-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/38] | Selting, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87103511.9 | 11.03.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860057458 | 14.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5745886 | JP19860057459 | 14.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5745986 | JP19860057460 | 14.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5746086 | JP19860062544 | 19.03.1986 Original published format: JP 6254486 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0237050 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0237050 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237050 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00, B65H1/04 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
B65H1/04 (EP,US);
B65H29/34 (EP);
B65H31/02 (EP);
B65H31/38 (EP);
B65H83/025 (EP);
G03G15/234 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/38] | Title | German: | Kassette für Kopien | [1987/38] | English: | Copy storing tray | [1987/38] | French: | Cassette pour copies | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 15.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5857144 ; | [A]JP58105248 ; | [A]JP59212331 ; | [A]JP6026544 ; | [A]JP6061429 ; | [XP]JP61156061 ; | [A]GB2141109 (XEROX CORP) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 146 (P-206)[1291], 25th June 1983; & JP-A-58 57 144 (RICOH K.K.) 05-04-1983, & JP5857144 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 210 (P-223)[1355], 16th September 1983; & JP-A-58 105 248 (RICOH K.K.) 23-06-1983, & JP58105248 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 84 (M-371)[1807], 13th April 1985; & JP-A-59 212 331 (FUJI XEROX K.K.) 01-12-1984, & JP59212331 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 149 (M-390)[1872], 25th June 1985; & JP-A-60 26 544 (RICOH K.K.) 09-02-1985, & JP6026544 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 198 (M-404)[1921], 15th August 1985; & JP-A-60 61 429 (KONISHIROKU SHASHIN KOGYO K.K.) 09-04-1985, & JP6061429 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 358 (P-522)[2415], 2nd December 1986; & JP-A-61 156 061 (SHARP CORP.) 15-07-1986, & JP61156061 A 00000000 |