Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] |
29.09.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] |
26.09.1990 | Change - designated states | published on 14.11.1990 [1990/46] |
06.04.1989 | First examination report | |
27.11.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] |
22.08.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.10.1987 [1987/41] |