EP0241729 - Unframed via interconnection with dielectyric etch stop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Manjin Jerome 1129 Glenmeadow Court Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Griffing, Bruce Frederick 2226 Garden Drive Schenectady New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Skelly, David William 8 Hollywood Drive Burnt Hills New York 12027 / US | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [1988/03] | Catherine, Alain, et al General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1987/43] | Catherine, Alain General Electric Company 42 Avenue Montaigne F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87103759.4 | 16.03.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | US19860845110 | 27.03.1986 Original published format: US 845110 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241729 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0241729 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/90, H01L21/316 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
H01L21/02178 (EP,US);
H01L21/145 (KR);
H01L21/02175 (EP,US);
H01L21/02194 (EP,US);
H01L21/02266 (EP,US);
H01L21/31116 (EP,US);
H01L21/31616 (US);
H01L21/76807 (EP,US);
H01L21/76885 (EP,US);
Y10S438/97 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | Unberandete Kontaktlochverbindung mit dielektrischer Ätzsperre | [1987/43] | English: | Unframed via interconnection with dielectyric etch stop | [1987/43] | French: | Interconnexion de liaison sans rebord avec un stoppeur diélectrique de gravure | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 14.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0175604 (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]); | [A]US4511430 (CHEN LEE [US], et al) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 9, no. 5, October 1966, pages 544-545, New YorkUS; P.P. CASTRUCCI et al.: "Etching technique for semi-conductor device application". | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 10, March 1982, pages 5133-5134, New YorkUS; S. BOYAR et al.: "Quartz trench RIE etch stop". | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOC., vol. 132, no. 8, August 1985, pages 1954-1957, Manchester, N.H.US; R.J. SAIA et al.: "Dry etching of tapered contact holes using multi-layer resist". | [A] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, Technical Digest, 6-8 December 1976, Washington, pages 205-207, IEEE, New YorkUS; R.C. POULSEN et al.: "Plasma etching of aluminium". |