EP0234600 - Ligand/receptor pair-binding compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | For all designated states THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM Mail Stop 1169 Room 216 Teague Building College Station Texas 77843-1120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | ||
For all designated states THE TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM Mail Stop 1169 Room 216 Teague Building College Station Texas 77843-1120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baldwin, Thomas Oakley c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | 02 /
Holzman, Thomas Fredric c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | 03 /
Satoh, Paul Shigemi c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | 04 /
Yein, Frederick Shu-Chung c/o The Upjohn Company 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | [1987/36] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87103808.9 | 17.02.1984 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | US19830469852 | 25.02.1983 Original published format: US 469852 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0234600 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C161/00, C07C161/02, C07D213/71, // G01N33/535 | [1987/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
C07C381/04 (EP,US);
C07J41/0016 (EP,US);
C07J41/005 (EP,US);
G01N33/535 (EP,US);
G01N33/581 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S435/964 (EP,US);
Y10S435/968 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Verbindungen für Bindungsreaktionen von Ligand-Rezeptor-Paaren | [1987/36] | English: | Ligand/receptor pair-binding compounds | [1987/36] | French: | Composés pour réactions de liaison des paires ligand-récepteur | [1987/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 01.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/17] | 13.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84301047.1 / EP0117693 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.1989 | 28.02.1991 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4237267 (OKUYAMA TSUNEO, et al); | [A]FR2382450 (PHARMACIA FINE CHEMICALS AB [SE]) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 26, October 1961, pages 3780-3783, Easton, Pa., US; T.P. JOHNSTON et al.: "Some S-substituted derivatives of 2-aminoethanethiol" | [AD] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 20, no. 3, 1981, pages 512-517, American Chemical Society, Easton, Pa., US; W.R. WELCHES et al.: "Active center studies on bacterial luciferase: modification of the enzyme with 2,4-dinitrofluorobenzene" | [A] - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 21, no. 8, 1982, pages 1807-1812, American Chemical Society, Easton, Pa., US; D.P. BLOXHAM et al.: "Formation of a polymethylene bis(disulfide) intersubunit cross-link between cysteine-281 residues in rabbit muscle glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase using octamethylene bis(methane[35S]thiosulfonate" |