EP0239870 - Process for the preparation of thixotropic binders, the binders obtained as a result of this process and their use in the preparation of coatings and sealants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wellner, Wolfgang, Dr. Bachstrasse 1 D-5060 Bergisch Gladbach 2 / DE | 02 /
Gruber, Hermann, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 87 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Fehlbier, Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Heddinghofener Strasse 56 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | [1987/41] | Application number, filing date | 87103913.7 | 17.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | DE19863610729 | 29.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3610729 | [1987/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239870 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239870 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239870 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/10, C08G18/32, C08G18/76, C09J3/14, C09D5/04 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
C08G18/7664 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/307 (US,EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3237 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1987/41] | C08G18/10, C08G18/32, C08G18/76, C09J3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von thixotropen Bindemitteln, die nach diesem Verfahren erhältlichen Bindemittel und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Beschichtungs- und Abdichtungsmitteln | [1987/41] | English: | Process for the preparation of thixotropic binders, the binders obtained as a result of this process and their use in the preparation of coatings and sealants | [1987/41] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de liants thixotropes, les liants obtenus à partir de ce procédé et leur utilisation pour la préparation de masses de revêtement et de scellement | [1987/41] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2019307 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]DE2359929 (MERCKENS NACHF KG AUGUST); | [A]EP0022497 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0052301 (BAYER AG [DE]) |