EP0240802 - Tool guiding device incorporating rule means for adjusting a guide rail to be put on a work piece relative to a desired line of cut [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1991 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Festo KG Ruiter Strasse 82 D-73734 Esslingen / DE | [1987/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maier, Peter, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) Gerokstrasse 1 D-7311 Neidlingen / DE | 02 /
Arnold, Günter Albstrasse 5 D-7441 Kohlberg / DE | 03 /
Attinger, Karl Seestrasse 21 D-7311 Holzmaden / DE | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Reimold, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Reimold, Otto, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys.Dr. H. Vetter Hölderlinweg 58 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104063.0 | 19.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863612215 | 11.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612215 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0240802 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0240802 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q9/00, B27C5/10 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B23Q9/0014 (EP);
B23Q17/2233 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/42] | Title | German: | Eine Massskala enthaltende Vorrichtung zum Justieren einer auf einem zu bearbeitenden Werkstück auflegbaren Führungsschiene bezüglich einer Bearbeitungs-Soll-Linie für ein Werkzeug | [1987/42] | English: | Tool guiding device incorporating rule means for adjusting a guide rail to be put on a work piece relative to a desired line of cut | [1987/42] | French: | Dispositif comportant une échelle de mesure pour l'ajustement, dans une direction exigée de travail d'un outil, d'un rail de guidage applicable sur la pièce à fabriquer | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 02.10.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/24] | 07.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3910146 ; | [Y]US4394800 ; | [A]US3390461 ; | [A]US4291602 ; | [A]US2906303 ; | [A]US2773523 ; | [A]US4028976 ; | [A]GB1103967 ; | [AP]GB2177971 |