EP0239886 - Fluidizer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/41] | Device for making a fluid | ||
[1989/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG Industriestrasse 22 9450 Altstätten / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states WAGNER INTERNATIONAL AG Industriestrasse 22 CH-9450 Altstätten / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rese, Arkadijus Waertergut 1 CH-9477 Truebbach / CH | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Münzhuber, Robert Patentanwalt Rumfordstrasse 10 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Münzhuber, Robert, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Rumfordstrasse 10 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104086.1 | 20.03.1987 | [1987/41] | Priority number, date | DE19863611039 | 02.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3611039 | [1987/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239886 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239886 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B05B7/14, B01F3/06, B05C19/00 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
B05B7/1445 (EP,US);
B01J8/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | Fluidisiereinrichtung | [1987/41] | English: | Fluidizer | [1989/41] | French: | Dispositif de fluidification | [1987/41] |
Former [1987/41] | Device for making a fluid | Examination procedure | 08.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 05.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.03.1990 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | US4018185 [ ] (MYERS JAMES LEWIS); | DE1750626 [ ]; | US3109680 [ ] (HERBERT BROOKS DONALD); | FR2153888 [ ] (CHAMPION SPARK PLUG CO); | DE3300228 [ ] (ARMOTEK IND INC [US]) |