EP0242610 - Substituted anilides of oleic, linoleic or linolenic acid as inhibitors of acyl-coa: cholesterol acyltransferase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoefle, Milton Louis 1020 Belmont Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | 02 /
Holmes, Ann 4641 Wylie Road Dexter Michigan 48130 / US | [1987/44] | Representative(s) | Mansmann, Ivo Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9 79090 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | Mansmann, Ivo Gödecke AG Patentwesen Mooswaldallee 1-9 D-79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104237.0 | 23.03.1987 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | US19860843420 | 24.03.1986 Original published format: US 843420 | US19870001561 | 16.01.1987 Original published format: US 1561 | [1987/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242610 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C103/60, A61K31/16 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
C07C233/09 (KR);
C07C233/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/44] | Title | German: | Substituierte Anilide von Öl-, Linol-, oder Linolensäure als Hemmer von Acyl-coa : Cholesterolacyltransferase | [1987/44] | English: | Substituted anilides of oleic, linoleic or linolenic acid as inhibitors of acyl-coa: cholesterol acyltransferase | [1987/44] | French: | Anilides substitués d'acide oléique, linoléique ou linolénique comme inhibiteurs d'acyl-coa : cholestérol acyltransférase | [1987/44] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/13] | Appeal following examination | 08.08.1990 | Appeal received No. T0907/90 | 04.10.1990 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.03.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]SU373348 ; | [X]AU415780C | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 79, no. 16, 22nd October 1973, pages 58-59, abstract no. 93369w, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-373 348 (K.A. KORNEV et al.) 12-03-1973, & SU373348 A 00000000 |