EP0239057 - Method of manufacturing a plastic-foam building element and building element manufactured by such method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Günthner, Rosa Steig 10/1 W-7210 Rottweil / DE | [1991/32] |
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Günthner, Otto Steig 10/1 D-7210 Rottweil / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/40] | Representative(s) | Mussgnug, Bernd, et al Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Mussgnug, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [1987/40] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 D-78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87104265.1 | 23.03.1987 | [1987/40] | Priority number, date | DE19863610012 | 25.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3610012 | [1987/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0239057 | Date: | 30.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0239057 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0239057 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/04, E04B1/80 | [1988/37] | CPC: |
E04C2/324 (EP);
B29C44/56 (EP);
B29C59/02 (EP);
E04C2/205 (EP);
E04F13/04 (EP);
B29K2105/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/40] | E04F13/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Bauelements aus Kunststoff-Hartschaum und nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Bauelement | [1987/40] | English: | Method of manufacturing a plastic-foam building element and building element manufactured by such method | [1987/40] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un élément de construction en matière plastique mousse rigide et élément fabriqué d'après ce procédé | [1987/40] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/10] | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.05.1991 | ES | 19.08.1991 | [2004/03] |
Former [1991/51] | SE | 08.05.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]CH490584 (ORBAN IMRE DIPL ING [CH]); | [YD]DE7621177U ; | [Y]CH618759 (MINDER H & B KADERLI FA); | [Y]DE3407184 (HERMANN WILHELM) |